THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:18:49 AM
Peniston, Charles Maclean
CPSO#:
51324
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 868-8374
Fax: (905) 868-8371
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES MACLEAN PENISTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENISTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 1984 |