THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:16:01 AM
Orser, Beverley Anne
CPSO#:
51317
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Beverley Orser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 11 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEVERLEY ANNE ORSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORSER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1987 |