THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:04:59 AM
Opris, Alexandru Antoniu Felician
CPSO#:
51315
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Romanian
Education: University of Cluj, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
217 Davenport Rd
Yorkville Vein Clinic
Toronto ON M5R 1J3
Phone: 4169270533
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRU ANTONIU FELICIAN OPRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPRIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1982 to 15 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2005 |