THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:16:24 AM
Duchesne, Cathy Jane
CPSO#:
51294
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Nuth, Catherine Jane (used until: 11 Aug 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON K2G 4B5
Phone: (613) 226-4030
Fax: (613) 225-3891
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHY JANE DUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCHESNE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1985 |