THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:02:45 AM
Nitkin, Robert Shane
CPSO#:
51281
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
06 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert S. Nitkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Stewardship of my medical records has been taken over by the 3 remaining Cardiologists: Dr Michael Ling, Dr Wayne Ho Ping Kong and Dr Raymond Chan.
Suite 404 - 4040 Finch Avenue East, Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Date Received: 06 May 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 May 2021 |