THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:48:21 PM
Hawash Mostafa, Fatma El-Zahraa
CPSO#:
51257
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Nov 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Mostafa, Fatima (used until: 24 Feb 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may write to the address, or call 519-672-1460.
Command Service Ltd.
100 Piccadilly St
London, ON N6A 1R8
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jul 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 1986 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 1986 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 Nov 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2024 |