THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:38:51 PM
Mosakoski, Joan Frances
CPSO#:
51252
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jan 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Mosakoski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |