THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:01:27 AM
Moon, Byung-Choo
CPSO#:
51233
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Prospect Street
Suite 300
Newmarket ON L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 898-7777
Fax: (905) 898-0880
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Byung Moon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2021
Corporation Name: Dr Byung Moon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BYUNG-CHOO MOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 01 Aug 1992
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1984 |