THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:10:18 PM
Siu, Victoria Mok
CPSO#:
51226
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Mok, Victoria (used until: 19 Jun 1985 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Medical Genetics Program of
Southwestern Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8140
Fax: (519) 685-8214
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTORIA MOK SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1985 |