THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:42:06 AM
Mroz, Krzysztof
CPSO#:
51220
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Polish, Spanish
Education: Slaska Academy of Medicine, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. Mroz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 12 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: November 30, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Mroz has resigned from the practice of medicine, effective November 30, 2013.