THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:07:56 AM
Mehra, Sunil
CPSO#:
51186
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Bhopal University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mehra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2023 |