THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 6:27:39 AM
McNeill, Brian Rodger
CPSO#:
51180
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
24 Hillcrest Avenue
St Thomas ON N5P 2J8
Phone: (519) 633-6610
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN RODGER MCNEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEILL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1982 to 15 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1985 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jun 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1983 |