THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:08:25 AM
Maleki-Yazdi, Mohammad Reza
CPSO#:
51154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 608
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 921-7704
Fax: (416) 921-3277
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD REZA MALEKI-YAZDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEKI-YAZDI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 1987 |