THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:39:41 PM
Malcolm, William Neil
CPSO#:
51153
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dundee, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Neil Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:20 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1981 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 18 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Sep 2021 |