THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 21:50:05 PM
Myers, Mary Lee
CPSO#:
51144
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
B6 114
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3479
Fax: (519) 663-3276
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. M. L. Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY LEE MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 1983 |