THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:14:46 PM
Murphy, Patricia Marie
CPSO#:
51140
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Charlton Avenue Site
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33243
Fax: (905) 521-6171
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARIE MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Nov 1983
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 12 Sep 1984 to 31 Dec 1984
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1996 |