THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:21:44 PM
Mulji, Amin Shaukatali
CPSO#:
51136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
260 Nebo Rd
CARDIOHEALTH
UNIT 200
Hamilton ON L8W 3K5
Phone: 1 877 718 2196
Fax: 1 877 718 0283
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIN SHAUKATALI MULJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULJI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1985 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Mulji’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Dr. Mulji was found guilty of assault under s. 266 and uttering a threat to cause harm under s. 264.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada. It is alleged that the offences are relevant to Dr. Mulji’s suitability to practice. It is also alleged that Dr. Mulji’s conduct underlying a criminal charge and/or finding of guilt are conduct unbecoming a physician and/or conduct relevant to the practice of medicine, that having regard to all the circumstances would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. It is also alleged that Dr. Mulji engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in that he failed to disclose to the College and/or failing to disclose in a timely manner, that he was charged with criminal offences and variations were made to his bail conditions.
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 15, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Amin Shaukatali Mulji was found guilty of the following offences:
1. Utter threat to cause death, contrary to section 264.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: April 29, 2022
SENTENCE: Suspended sentence with 2 years’ probation; DNA Order; 10 year Weapons Prohibition
Probation conditions:
1. Reporting obligations
2. Attend for counselling, treatment or assessment as may be deemed appropriate by the probation officer and sign releases as required.
3. No contact direct or indirect with a named person.
4. Do not be within 10 metres of a named person and 100 metres of any place named person is known to be, their place of residence, employment, worship, recreation, or schooling, with specified exception.