THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:00:45 PM
Laschuk, Bohdan Stephan
CPSO#:
51123
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Laschuk, Bohdan Stephen (used until: 21 Jul 2003 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BOHDAN STEPHAN LASCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASCHUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1986 |