THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:09:37 PM
Lamarre, Michelle Ann
CPSO#:
51116
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lamarre, Michelle (used until: 15 Jul 1984 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. P. G. Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 18 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |