THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:59:12 AM
Laforte, Anne Rosemary
CPSO#:
51112
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
La Forte-Clarke, Anne Rosemary (used until: 06 Sep 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 3324 Station Main
Sarnia ON N7T 8G6
Phone: 519-332-1117
Fax: 519-332-1119
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: La Forte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE ROSEMARY LAFORTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFORTE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1985 |