THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:07:54 PM
McCormick, Charles Clifford Kirkpatrick
CPSO#:
51093
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Apr 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Apr 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5Y8
Phone: (905) 358-0171 Ext. 53386
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES CLIFFORD KIRKPATRICK MCCORMICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCORMICK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 1984 |