THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:21:15 AM
Mace, Frank Jan
CPSO#:
51066
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Frank J. Mace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 02 Oct 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 02 Oct 2018 |
|
Active |