THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:17:19 PM
Maxwell, Howard Brent
CPSO#:
51056
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: HB Maxwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
7-2014 Valleyrun Blvd
Date Received: 27 May 2022
Instructions/Address:London Health Science Center- London Ontario
St Joseph's Health Center London Ontario
Date Received: 02 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 May 2022 |