THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:02:57 AM
Matys, Gail Lynn
CPSO#:
51053
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
27 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice
as of
29 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: G. Matys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:204 - 99 Kakulu Road
Ottawa ON K2L 3C8
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Nov 2021 |