THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:48:19 PM
Love, William Robert
CPSO#:
51022
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
284 Rossmore Blvd
Burlington ON L7N 1R6
Phone: 9054678204
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: William R. Love, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 7 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Contact above
Records Management Ltd.
1.800.775.0093 or [email protected]
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 21 Feb 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:24 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ROBERT LOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 1983 |