THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:51:29 AM
Kwamie, Yosef Kwaku
CPSO#:
51009
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Univ of Ghana, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yosef Kwamie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:HEALTH RECORDS DEPARTMENT,
LAKERIDGE HEALTH OSHAWA,
1 HOSPITAL COURT,
OSHAWA,
ONTARIO L1G 2B9
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Dec 1992
Summary:
In December 1992, Dr. Kwamie pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Kwamie guilty of professional misconduct. The Committee agreed to a joint submission as to penalty, and consequently imposed the following penalty:
1. Dr. Kwamie was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. Dr. Kwamie was to pay a fine in the amount of $5000.00 within thirty days of this Order becoming final.
3. Dr. Kwamie(s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of three months.
4. Should Dr. Kwamie be the subject of subsequent Discipline proceedings, the record of this proceeding was to form part of such proceedings.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 14 Dec 1992