THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 21:45:04 PM
Kirkpatrick, Howard Roy
CPSO#:
50976
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville Professional Building
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 205
Huntsville ON P1H 1H8
Phone: 705-787-1876
Fax: (705) 990 1415
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOWARD ROY KIRKPATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRKPATRICK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 1986 |