THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:53:30 PM
Killorn, William Patrick
CPSO#:
50969
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 639-3209
Fax: (905) 639-3452
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:21 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PATRICK KILLORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILLORN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 6 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2007 |