THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:51:03 AM
Khan, Aliya Aziz
CPSO#:
50958
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Feb 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Khan, Aliya (used until: 12 Jul 1988 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 223
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 844-5677
Fax: (905) 844-8966
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALIYA AZIZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 1985 |