THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:53:40 PM
Linders, Patricia Mary
CPSO#:
50952
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jan 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Linders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Tolkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARY LINDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDERS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1986 |