THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:58:53 AM
Little, Sian Caroline Crawford
CPSO#:
50939
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Nov 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 12 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2019 |