THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:42:41 AM
Leclerc, Yves
CPSO#:
50907
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's Reg Cardiac Care Centre
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6937
Fax: (519) 749-6492
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:28 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YVES LECLERC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LECLERC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Oct 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1998 |