THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:52:37 AM
Leadman, Martha Louise
CPSO#:
50903
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Martha Leadman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 14, 2017, Erin Shores HealthCare notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Martha L. Leadman resigned her privileges at Erin Shores HealthCare in connection with concerns regarding Dr. Leadman’s radiology practice at Erin Shores Healthcare.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:10 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2019 |