THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:28:43 AM
Jarvi, Keith Allen
CPSO#:
50845
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6th Floor Box 19
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8867
Fax: (416) 586-8354
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:13 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEITH ALLEN JARVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1984 |