THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:17:57 AM
Hussein, Naushad
CPSO#:
50811
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 127
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON L3R 9S2
Phone: 1 855 393 2565
Fax: 855 393 2565
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Naushad Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:17 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAUSHAD HUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1986 |