THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:06:49 PM
Hussaini, Syed Muzafarullah
CPSO#:
50810
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Osmania University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 179
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 977-6768
Fax: (519) 977-7690
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Hussaini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2008
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYED MUZAFARULLAH HUSSAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAINI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2009 |