THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:59:30 PM
Husband, Carol Anne
CPSO#:
50809
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Sep 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Husband Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2019 |