THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:18:57 AM
Horn, Edward Robert
CPSO#:
50795
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University Complutense of Madrid, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6918
Fax: (613) 761-3602
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Edward R. Horn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD ROBERT HORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1993 |