THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:32:18 AM
Holtby, Helen Mary Koppell
CPSO#:
50787
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Richard M. Holtby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
M5G 1X8
Date Received: 25 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |