THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:25:42 PM
Gow, Robert Malcolm
CPSO#:
50772
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Dec 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3257
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT MALCOLM GOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Jan 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1988 |