THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 7:41:07 AM
Vinson, Robert Stanley
CPSO#:
50736
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert S. Vinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:22 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2021 |