THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:06:15 PM
Konn, George
CPSO#:
50735
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Professional Building
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 206
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 619-8778
Fax: (905) 619-8998
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE KONN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1985 |