THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:22:06 AM
Hill, Laurie Leigh
CPSO#:
50720
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
31 Centre St S
Brampton ON L6W 2X7
Phone: 9054553010
Fax: 9054553011
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:04 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURIE LEIGH HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2006 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jun 2006
Summary:
On June 14, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Laurie Leigh Hill committed professional misconduct in that he had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise medicine. The Discipline Committee ordered that:
(a) the Registrar shall suspend Dr. Hill's certificate of registration for a period of four months commencing July 1, 2006, two months of which will be suspended if Dr. Hill takes the College's ethics course or suitable equivalent course approved in advance by the Registrar by December 31, 2006.
(b) Dr. Hill be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand recorded on the register;
(c) the following terms, conditions or limitations will be placed on Dr. Hill's certificate of registration:
(i) Dr. Hill will retain a monitor acceptable to the College who will review Dr. Hill's OHIP billings bimonthly for 12 months. Dr. Hill will provide the billing mentor with any documentation which he or she may request, and the billing monitor will report his or her findings to the Registrar quarterly. The cost of this review shall be borne by Dr. Hill.
(ii) Upon completion of the period of monitoring, reference to it will be deleted from Dr. Hill's certificate of registration
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 14, 2006