THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:27:46 PM
Henry, Mary Alice
CPSO#:
50708
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Apr 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2021 |