THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:36:28 AM
Hendry, Paul Jonathan
CPSO#:
50706
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jan 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Mar 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul J. Hendry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 18 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2024 |