THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:55:05 AM
Hellyer, Deborah Jean
CPSO#:
50702
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
15 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Apr 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
15-Nov-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Deborah Hellyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2021
Corporation Name: Deborah Hellyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 28 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 1984 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 15 Nov 2022 |