THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 22:12:55 PM
Hegele, Robert Alexander
CPSO#:
50701
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-1151 Richmond St
Robarts Research Institute - Wester
London ON N6A 5B7
Phone: 5199315271
Fax: 5199315218
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:11 Sep 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT ALEXANDER HEGELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGELE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1988 |