THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:20:14 AM
Hausen, Doris Magdalene
CPSO#:
50695
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D. Hausen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:KMH Cardiology Centres Inc.
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga, On
L5K 2L3
Date Received: 03 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:29 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2022 |