THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:30:45 AM
Hartman, Alexander
CPSO#:
50691
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
True North Imaging
Suite 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HARTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1983 |