THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:08:10 PM
Hart, Lawrence Errol
CPSO#:
50688
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Not In Practice
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. L. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical Records are being stored with RSRS at 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 17 Jun 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:21 May 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ERROL HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1986 |